|
| Members of the Seimas - Vincė Vaidevutė MARGEVIČIENĖ | LT |
| | Vincė Vaidevutė MARGEVIČIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Women's Parliamentary Group, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Welfare of the Child, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Islamic Republic of Afghanistan, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Armenia, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Arab Republic of Egypt, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Japan, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Latin America, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the People's Republic of China, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Ukraine, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Portuguese Republic, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Communities and Civil Society, Member ( 2012-12-13–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Chechen Republic of Itchkeria, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group "For Human Dignity", Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the State of Israel, Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group “For Historical Memory and Justice”, Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group "For the Family", Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Verkhovna Rada of Ukraine, Member ( 2012-12-27–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Friendship with Nagorno-Karabakh, Member ( 2013-03-14–2013-03-18 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Georgia, Member ( 2013-03-19–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Monitoring the Coordination of Regional Development, Member ( 2014-03-03–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for the Territorial Integrity of the GUAM (Georgia, Ukraine, Azerbaijan, Moldova) Countries, Member ( 2014-03-10–2014-03-19 )
- Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Indonesia, Member ( 2014-03-13–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with Malaysia, Member ( 2014-03-13–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with the 8th Term of the Supreme Council of the Republic of Belarus and with its Democratic Forces, Member ( 2014-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with South African Republic, Member ( 2014-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Holy See, Member ( 2015-06-04–2016-11-14 )
- Tarpparlamentinių ryšių su Mongolija grupė, Member ( 2015-09-28–2016-11-14 )
History Was elected to the Seimas 2004 – 2008. Was elected to the Seimas 2008 – 2012.
Biography
Date of birth
Place of birth
|
12 May 1949
Irkutsk Region, Russia
|
Education
2001–2002
1997–1999
|
Lithuanian Institute of Public Administration, OLYMP programme
Kaunas University of Technology, Faculty of Administration, MA in Public Administration |
1967–1972
|
Vilnius State University (currently Vilnius University), Faculty of Natural Sciences, BA in Biology |
1960–1967
1956–1960 |
Secondary School No 22 in Vilnius
Cheremkhovo Primary School
|
Work experience
1997–2004
|
Director, Department of Social Affairs, Culture and Education, Administration of the Governor of Kaunas County |
1985–1995
1972–1985 |
Physician and Cytologist, Kaunas Oncology Clinic
Physician and Laboratory Assistant, Lithuanian Oncology Clinic |
1968–1972 |
Junior Research Fellow, Institute of Biochemistry, Lithuanian Academy of Sciences
|
Political career
|
Member of the Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrats |
Since 2012
|
Member, Committee on State Administration and Local Authorities
Deputy Chair, Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction
Deputy Chair, Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
Member, Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Verkhovna Rada of Ukraine |
2008–2012
|
Member, Committee on Social Affairs and Labour
Chair, Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction |
Since 2009
|
Deputy Chair, Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group in the Seimas
Deputy Chair, Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrats |
2004–2008
|
Member, Committee on Social Affairs and Labour
Member, Commission for Prevention of Drug Addition
Member, Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of Members of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania, the Sejm and Senate of the Republic of Poland, and the Verkhovna Rada of Ukraine |
1997–2001
1995–1997 |
Member, Kaunas City Municipal Council
Deputy Mayor of Kaunas City
|
Miscellaneous
Member, Lithuanian Red Cross Society
Member, Social Innovation Fund
Member, women’s club MILDA (Women’s Initiative in Lithuania for Democracy Growth)
Interests: addiction prevention, well-being of children, rights of persons with disabilities, decent old age and regional development
Foreign languages: English, Polish and Russian
Hobby: floriculture, art and literature
|
|