|
| Members of the Seimas - Giedrė PURVANECKIENĖ | LT |
| | Giedrė PURVANECKIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Women's Parliamentary Group, Deputy Head ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Welfare of the Child, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Azerbaijan, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Arab Republic of Egypt, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Japan, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Latin America, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the People's Republic of China, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Canada, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United States of America, Member ( 2012-12-06–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Italian Republic, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Nordic Countries (Kingdom of Denmark, Republic of Iceland, Kingdom of Norway, Republic of Finland, Kingdom of Sweden), Head ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Association of European Parliamentarians with Africa, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Development Cooperation and Reproductive Health and Rights, Member ( 2012-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the State of Israel, Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly, Head ( 2012-12-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Russian Federation, Member ( 2013-04-04–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group "Parliamentarians Against Trafficking in Human Beings", Member ( 2013-04-24–2014-10-08 )
- Parliamentary Group of Friends of Neringa Town, Member ( 2014-01-23–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group "Parliamentarians Against Trafficking in Human Beings", Head ( 2014-10-09–2016-11-14 )
History Was elected to the Seimas 2000 – 2004.
Biography
Date of birth |
8 March 1945 |
Place of birth |
Kaunas, Lithuania |
|
|
Education |
|
1982 |
PhD in Social Sciences (Educational Sciences) |
1963–1968 |
Faculty of Physics, Vilnius State University (currently Vilnius University), studies of semiconductor physics |
1952–1963 |
Salomėja Nėris Secondary School (currently Salomėja Nėris Gymnasium) in Vilnius |
|
|
Work experience |
|
2006–2008 |
Adviser to the Prime Minister on social, educational and scientific policy |
2004–2005 |
Head, Bureau of Justas Paleckis, Member of the European Parliament |
2004–2012 |
Associate Professor, Department of Educology, Faculty of Philosophy, Vilnius University |
1997–2000 |
Adviser, United Nations Development Programme in Lithuania |
1996–1997 |
Adviser on Family and Women’s Issues, Government of the Republic of Lithuania |
Since 1995 |
Associate Professor, Vilnius University |
1994–1996 |
State Counsellor on Women’s Issues, Government of the Republic of Lithuania |
1973–2004 |
Senior Laboratory Assistant, Head of the Laboratory, Junior Research Fellow, then Research fellow, Head of Section, Senior Lecturer and Associate Professor, Vilnius University |
1968–1973 |
Junior Research Fellow, Institute of Semiconductors, Academy of Sciences |
|
|
Political career |
|
|
Member of the Lithuanian Social Democratic Party |
Since 2012 |
Member, Committee on Social Affairs and Labour |
|
Member, Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction |
|
Member, Lithuanian Social Democratic Party Political Group |
|
Chair, Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly |
2000–2004 |
Member, Committee on Foreign Affairs |
|
Member, Committee on National Security and Defence |
|
Member, Conference of Chairs |
|
Chair, Commission on Family and Child Affairs |
|
Chair, Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly |
Since 2009 |
Member of the Presidium, Deputy Chair, Lithuanian Social Democratic Party |
Since 1999 |
Member, Council of the Lithuanian Social Democratic Party |
|
Deputy Chair, Lithuanian Union of Social Democratic Women |
Since 1998 |
Member of the Lithuanian Social Democratic Party |
Miscellaneous
Other activities: traineeships in Norway (1993), Sweden (1996) and the USA (1995); co-founder of the Vilnius University Gender Studies Centre and the first Chair of the Board; initiator of the establishment of a non-governmental organisation Women’s Information Centre and the first Chair of the Board; Member of the Lithuanian Committee of the International Family Year and the Vice-Chairperson of the National Preparatory Committee for the 4th World Conference on Women in Beijing; participant in various international meetings and scientific conferences on gender equality, elimination of domestic violence, educational and family matters
Publications: author of over 60 scientific and other publications in Lithuania and abroad
Foreign languages: English, Russian, Polish
Hobbies: floriculture, swimming, picking mushrooms
Family
Married with two children
|
|