|
| Members of the Seimas - Vida Marija ČIGRIEJIENĖ | LT |
| | Vida Marija ČIGRIEJIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Women's Parliamentary Group, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Welfare of the Child, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Azerbaijan, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Japan, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group of Dzūkija Friends, Member ( 2012-12-14–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Chechen Republic of Itchkeria, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Taiwan, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Development Cooperation and Reproductive Health and Rights, Member ( 2012-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group "For Animal Welfare and Protection", Member ( 2013-05-09–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Supporting the Idea of the Underground in Vilnius, Member ( 2013-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Holy See, Member ( 2015-06-04–2016-11-14 )
History Was elected to the Seimas 2004 – 2008. Was elected to the Seimas 2008 – 2012.
Biography
Date of birth
Place of birth
Education
1999
1983
1972
1964–1967
1955–1961
1948–1955 |
4 October 1936
Alytus, Lithuania
Thesis of Doctor Habilis, title of Professor
Associate Professor, Kaunas Institute of Medicine (currently Lithuanian University of Health Sciences)
Doctoral thesis, Doctor’s Degree
Diploma of Obstetrician and Gynaecologist, clinical residency, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology, Kaunas Institute of Medicine
Diploma of Physician, Therapeutic Faculty, Kaunas Institute of Medicine
Secondary School No 2 in Utena |
Work experience
1999–2004
1991–2001
1989–1990
Since 1982
1967–1989
1967–1972
1961–1964 |
Head, Oncogynaecological Section, Clinic of Kaunas University of Medicine (currently Lithuanian University of Health Sciences)
Head, Kaunas University of Medicine Clinic of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Assistant to Chief Doctor for Obstetrics and Gynaecology Matters, Clinic of Kaunas Academy of Medicine (currently Lithuanian University of Health Sciences)
Associate Professor, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology, Kaunas University of Medicine
Physician, Clinic of Kaunas Institute of Medicine
Assistant, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology, Kaunas Institute of Medicine
Obstetrician and Gynaecologist at a local hospital in Kybartai and at the central hospital in Vilkaviškis
|
Political career
Since 2012
2008–2012
2004–2008 |
Member of the Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrat Party
Member, Committee on Health Affairs
Deputy Chair, Petitions Commission
Member, Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
Member, Committee on Health Affairs
Deputy Chair, Commission for Ethics and Procedures
Member, Homeland Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
Member, Committee on Health Affairs
Member, Petitions Commission
|
Miscellaneous
|
Over 300 publications on obstetrics, gynaecology and oncogynaecology in Lithuanian and foreign press
Author or co-author of several textbooks, monographs and books
Presentations at national and international seminars and conferences
Member of editorial board for the magazines Medicina, Lietuvos akušerija ir ginekologija, and Gydymo menas
Founder of the Perinatal Centre
Member of Dzūkai Friends’ Society
Member of the Regional Obstetrics and Gynaecology Society
Member, Lithuanian Union of Physicians
Member, Lithuanian Union of Political Prisoners and Deportees (since 1996)
Languages: Russian, English, Polish
Hobbies: tourism, culture |
Family |
Widow with three children |
|
|