|
| Members of the Seimas - Audronė PITRĖNIENĖ | LT |
| | Audronė PITRĖNIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Conference of Chairs, Member ( 2012-11-17–2013-05-13 )
- Women's Parliamentary Group, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Armenia, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Czech Republic and the Slovak Republic, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Albania, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Austria, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Belarus, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Georgia, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Turkey, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Latin America, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Japan, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the People's Republic of China, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the French Republic, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Poland, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United States of America, Member ( 2012-12-06–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Portuguese Republic, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Hungary, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Italian Republic, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Estonia, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Bulgaria, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Kazakhstan, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Latvia, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Sejm and Senate of the Republic of Poland, Member ( 2012-12-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Russian Federation, Member ( 2013-04-04–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Assisting Rural Communities and Farmers in Addressing Matters of Their Concern, Member ( 2013-05-23–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Supporting the Idea of the Underground in Vilnius, Member ( 2013-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Monitoring the Coordination of Regional Development, Head ( 2014-01-23–2016-11-14 )
History Was elected to the Seimas 2004 – 2008.
Biography
Date of birth |
21 July 1958 |
Place of birth |
Lenkimai Village, Skuodas District, Lithuania |
|
|
Education |
|
2004 |
Graduation from Klaipėda University, Master’s Degree in Educational Science |
1984 |
Graduation from Vilnius State Pedagogical Institute (currently Lithuanian University of Educational Sciences), Diploma of Teacher of Biology and Agriculture |
1976 |
Graduation from Ylakiai Secondary School (currently Ylakiai Gymnasium) in Skuodas District |
|
|
Work experience |
|
2010–2012 |
Chief Specialist, Division of Education, Skuodas District Municipality |
2009–2010 |
Executive Manager, Mosėdis Neighbourhood, Skuodas District |
1999–2004 |
Head of School, Pranciškus Žadeikis Gymnasium in Skuodas District |
1998–1999 |
Head of School, Mosėdis Secondary School in Skuodas District |
1988–1998 |
Head of School, Gėsalai Basic School in Skuodas District |
1986–1988 |
Head of School, Trumplaukė Basic School in Skuodas District |
1984–1986 |
Lecturer, Vilnius Trade Vocational College |
|
|
Political career |
|
|
Member of the Labour Party |
Since 2012 |
Chair, Committee on Education, Science and Culture |
|
Member, Petitions Commission |
|
Deputy Chair, Labour Party Political Group |
|
Member, Conference of Chairs |
|
Member, Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Sejm and Senate of the Republic of Poland |
2004–2008 |
Chair, Committee on Education, Science and Culture |
|
Member, Seimas Delegation to the Assembly of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Sejm and Senate of the Republic of Poland |
Since 2003 |
Member of the Labour Party |
Miscellaneous
Activities: developer and manager of projects for schools, presidents of schools, chairs of school councils and members of the Lithuanian Pupil’s parliament; coordinator of Skuodas Distric Municipality projects for leaders and on the development of pre-school education; lectures on leadership in schools and safety of children on the road
Publications: articles for the local newspapers Skuodas and Mūsų žodis
Languages: Lithuanian (native), Russian, German
Hobbies: art, theatre
Family
Married with two children
|
|