|
| Members of the Seimas - Irena DEGUTIENĖ | LT |
| | Irena DEGUTIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | - Deputy Speaker ( 2012-11-17–2016-11-14 )
Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Conference of Chairs, Member ( 2012-11-17–2016-11-14 )
- Women's Parliamentary Group, Deputy Head ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Azerbaijan, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group “For Corruption-Free Lithuania”, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Latin America, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Georgia, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Japan, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the People's Republic of China, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Poland, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Ukraine, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United States of America, Member ( 2012-12-06–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Estonia, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group of Dzūkija Friends, Member ( 2012-12-14–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group "For Human Dignity", Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Swiss Confederation, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Latvia, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Federal Republic of Germany, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the State of Israel, Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group "For the Family", Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly, Member ( 2012-12-27–2016-11-14 )
History Was elected to the Seimas 1996 – 2000. Was elected to the Seimas 2000 – 2004. Was elected to the Seimas 2004 – 2008. Was elected to the Seimas 2008 – 2012.
Biography
Date
of birth
|
1 June 1949
|
Place
of birth
|
Šiauliai, Lithuania
|
|
|
Education
|
|
1968–1974
|
Vilnius State University
(currently Vilnius University), Faculty of Medicine, Diploma of Medical Doctor
|
1956–1967
|
Secondary School No 1 in
Druskininkai (currently Atgimimas Secondary School)
|
|
|
Work experience
|
|
1994–1996
|
Secretary, Ministry of Health
of the Republic of Lithuania
|
1976–1994
|
Physician Anesthesiologist-Reanimathologist; Deputy Head Physician, Head Physician,
Gastroenterology Division, Vilnius University Red Cross Hospital
|
1974–1976
|
Physician Therapist, Cotton
Mill in Alytus
|
1967–1968
|
Druskininkai branch, Kaunas
Art Workshops
|
|
|
Political career
|
|
|
Member of the Homeland
Union – Lithuanian Christian Democrats
|
Since 2012
|
Deputy Speaker, Member of the
Board of the Seimas
|
|
Member, Committee on Budget
and Finance
|
|
Member, Homeland Union –
Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
|
|
Member, Conference of Chairs
|
|
Member, Seimas Delegation to
the Baltic Assembly
|
17 September 2009–2012
|
Speaker of the Seimas, Member
of the Board of the Seimas
|
2008–2009
|
Deputy Speaker, then First
Deputy Speaker, Member of the Board of the Seimas
|
|
Member, Committee on Social
Affairs and Labour
|
|
Member, Conference of Chairs
|
|
Chair, Seimas Delegation to
the Assembly of Members of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania, the Sejm
and Senate of the Republic of Poland, and the Verkhovna Rada of Ukraine
|
2004–2008
|
Member, Committee on Social
Affairs and Labour
|
|
Member, Commission for Family
and Child Affairs
|
|
Member, Conference of Chairs
|
2000–2004
|
Deputy Chair, Committee on
Social Affairs and Labour
|
|
Member, Commission for Family
and Child Affairs
|
May–June, October–November 1999
|
Acting Prime Minister
|
1996–2000
|
Minister of Social Security
and Labour
|
1996–2000
|
Member, Committee on Social
Affairs and Labour
|
Since 1994
|
Member of the Homeland Union
(Lithuanian Conservatives), Member of the Party Presidium
|
Miscellaneous
Awards: Person of the Year in
the field of medicine and social security (1997)
Interests: health protection,
family policy, rights of the child, social matters, strengthening of civil
society
Languages: Lithuanian (native), English, Polish,
Russian
Hobbies: art, music, cycling, swimming, skiing
Family
Married with two children
|
|