|
|
| Members of the Seimas - Andrius PALIONIS | LT |
| | Andrius PALIONIS
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Armenia, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Azerbaijan, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Belarus, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Arab Republic of Egypt, Member ( 2012-12-03–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Turkey, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Deputy Head ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Georgia, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Ukraine, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United States of America, Member ( 2012-12-06–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Hungary, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Italian Republic, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Estonia, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group of Dzūkija Friends, Member ( 2012-12-14–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Latvia, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Kazakhstan, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Russian Federation, Member ( 2013-04-04–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Resorts and Resort Areas, Head ( 2013-04-11–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Assisting Rural Communities and Farmers in Addressing Matters of Their Concern, Member ( 2013-05-23–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Cuba, Member ( 2013-06-11–2016-11-14 )
- Provisional Group for Supporting the Idea of the Underground in Vilnius, Deputy Head ( 2013-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Sultanate of Oman, Member ( 2015-04-10–2016-11-14 )
Biography
Date of birth |
5 June 1975 |
Place of birth |
Kaunas, Lithuania |
|
|
Education |
|
1998 |
Graduation from Vilnius University, Faculty of Economics, BA in Accounting and Audit |
1993 |
Graduation from Šeškinė Secondary School |
|
|
Work Experience |
|
2006–2012 |
Director, private company UAB BTN |
2001–2012 |
Chief Financial Officer, private company UAB Ginvesta |
2000–2001 |
Public company AB SEB Bank |
1996–2000 |
Public company AB Hermis Bank |
1995–1996 |
Lithuanian Joint-Stock Innovation Bank |
1994–1995 |
Chief Specialist, Lithuanian Department of Statistics |
|
|
Political Career |
|
|
Member of the Lithuanian Social Democratic Party |
Since 2012 |
Member, Committee on Budget and Finance |
|
Member, Energy Commission |
|
Member, Commission for Ethics and Procedures |
|
Member, Lithuanian Social Democratic Party Political Group |
Miscellaneous
Hobbies: hunting, shooting sports, farming, charitable activities
Family
Married with two daughters
|
|
|
|