|
| Members of the Seimas - Jolita VAICKIENĖ | LT |
| | Jolita VAICKIENĖ
| |
Member of the Seimas from 2012-11-16 till 2016-11-14.
|
| |
| Position | Committees of the SeimasCommissions of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Women's Parliamentary Group, Member ( 2012-11-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of India, Member ( 2012-12-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the People's Republic of China, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Ukraine, Member ( 2012-12-05–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the United States of America, Member ( 2012-12-06–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Estonia, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Portuguese Republic, Member ( 2012-12-12–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Communities and Civil Society, Member ( 2012-12-13–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Swiss Confederation, Member ( 2012-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Development Cooperation and Reproductive Health and Rights, Member ( 2012-12-19–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the State of Israel, Member ( 2012-12-20–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly, Member ( 2012-12-27–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Malta, Member ( 2013-01-18–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Assisting Rural Communities and Farmers in Addressing Matters of Their Concern, Member ( 2013-05-23–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Romania, Member ( 2013-06-03–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Zambia, Member ( 2013-06-25–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Tadzhikistan, Deputy Head ( 2013-07-09–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for Monitoring the Coordination of Regional Development, Member ( 2014-01-23–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with the Republic of Indonesia, Member ( 2014-03-13–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with Malaysia, Member ( 2014-03-13–2016-11-14 )
- Parliamentary Group for the Territorial Integrity of the GUAM (Georgia, Ukraine, Azerbaijan, Moldova) Countries, Member ( 2014-06-26–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with Georgia, Member ( 2014-07-28–2016-11-14 )
- Seimas Group for Inter-parliamentary Relations with the 8th Term of the Supreme Council of the Republic of Belarus and with its Democratic Forces, Member ( 2014-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with South African Republic, Deputy Head ( 2014-12-18–2016-11-14 )
- Group for Inter-Parliamentary Relations with the Holy See, Member ( 2015-06-04–2016-11-14 )
- Group of Young Parliamentarians, Member ( 2015-09-15–2016-11-14 )
Biography
Date of birth |
25 September 1970 |
Place of birth |
Radviliškis, Lithuania |
|
|
Education |
|
|
|
1988–1993 |
Vilnius University, Faculty of Economics, Diploma of Economist |
1977–1988 |
Kretinga Secondary School No 3 |
|
|
Work Experience |
|
|
|
2011–2012 |
Director of Administration, Kretinga District Municipality |
2003–2011 |
Director, private company UAB Vijomeda |
2002–2003 |
Senior Accountant, private company UAB Vakarų medienos grupė |
1997–2001 |
Senior Accountant, private company UAB Lijota |
1994–1996 |
Senior Accountant, Coca Cola Gėrimai |
1993–1994 |
Senior Accountant, investment company Investicijos į Palangą |
|
|
Political career |
|
|
Member of the Party “Order and Justice” |
Since 2012 |
Chair, Committee on Audit |
|
Member, Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction |
|
Member, Order and Justice Political Group |
|
Member, Seimas Delegation to the Baltic Assembly |
2009–2011 |
Deputy Mayor, Kretinga District Municipality |
2007–2011 |
Member, Kretinga District Municipal Council |
Since 2006 |
Member, Liberal Democratic Party (currently – Party “Order and Justice” |
Miscellaneous
Foreign languages: Russian, English
Interests: history of Lithuania, domestic policy, international relations, tourism, music, books
Family
Two children: a son and a daughter
|
|