Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Committee on Environment Protection
Remit of the Committee on Environment Protection
Committee on Audit
Committee on Budget and Finance
Committee on Economics
Committee on European Affairs
Committee on the Development of Information Society
Committee on Rural Affairs
Committee on National Security and Defence
Committee on Social Affairs and Labour
Committee on Health Affairs
Committee on Education, Science and Culture
Committee on Legal Affairs
Committee on Foreign Affairs
Committee on State Administration and Local Authorities
Committee on Human Rights
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Parliamentary groups
Committee on Environment Protection
LT
Name
Position
Linas
BALSYS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Agnė
BILOTAITĖ
Member: 2012-11-20–2013-10-02
Viktorija
ČMILYTĖ-NIELSEN
Member: 2015-04-29–2016-11-14
Arūnas
DUDĖNAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Valentinas
MAZURONIS
Member: 2012-11-20–2014-06-25
Vidas
MIKALAUSKAS
Member: 2015-07-02–2016-11-14
Gintautas
MIKOLAITIS
Member: 2012-11-22–2016-11-14
Raimundas
PALIUKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2015-06-02
Rimas Antanas
RUČYS
Member: 2014-07-10–2016-11-14
Algimantas
SALAMAKINAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2012-11-21
Chair: 2012-11-22–2016-11-14
Paulius
SAUDARGAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2012-12-03
Deputy Chair: 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Aurelija
STANCIKIENĖ
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Darius
ULICKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Remit of the Committee on Environment Protection
© Office of the Seimas
HOME