Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Committee on Environment Protection
Committee on Audit
Committee on Budget and Finance
Committee on Economics
Committee on European Affairs
Committee on the Development of Information Society
Committee on Rural Affairs
Committee on National Security and Defence
13 06 12 NSGK posėdžio darbotvarkė
Remit of the Committee on National Security and Defence
Committee on Social Affairs and Labour
Committee on Health Affairs
Committee on Education, Science and Culture
Committee on Legal Affairs
Committee on Foreign Affairs
Committee on State Administration and Local Authorities
Committee on Human Rights
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Parliamentary groups
Committee on National Security and Defence
LT
Name
Position
Remigijus
AČAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2015-04-28
Arvydas
ANUŠAUSKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Gediminas
JAKAVONIS
Member: 2012-11-20–2012-11-26
Member: 2013-01-17–2016-11-14
Rasa
JUKNEVIČIENĖ
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Algis
KAŠĖTA
Member: 2012-11-20–2015-04-08
Michal
MACKEVIČ
Member: 2012-11-20–2012-12-03
Deputy Chair: 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Vytautas Antanas
MATULEVIČIUS
Member: 2015-04-29–2016-11-14
Andrius
MAZURONIS
Member: 2013-10-22–2016-11-14
Juozas
OLEKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Artūras
PAULAUSKAS
Member: 2012-11-27–2012-12-03
Chair: 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Darius
PETROŠIUS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Eduardas
ŠABLINSKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
Valdas
VASILIAUSKAS
Member: 2012-11-20–2016-11-14
13 06 12 NSGK posėdžio darbotvarkė
Remit of the Committee on National Security and Defence
© Office of the Seimas
HOME