Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Labour Party Political Group
"The Way of Courage" Political Group (till 06/19/2014)
Order and Justice Political Group
Liberals Movement Political Group
Lithuanian Poles' Electoral Action Political Group
Lithuanian Social Democratic Party Political Group
Non-attached Members
Homeland Union - Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
Parliamentary groups
Non-attached Members
LT
Name
Position
Remigijus
AČAS
Member : 2013-03-12–2015-12-21
Linas
BALSYS
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Rima
BAŠKIENĖ
Chair: 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Stasys
BRUNDZA
Member : 2016-04-21–2016-05-04
Vida Marija
ČIGRIEJIENĖ
Member : 2016-06-07–2016-11-14
Arimantas
DUMČIUS
Member : 2016-06-07–2016-11-14
Povilas
GYLYS
Member : 2014-06-20–2015-12-22
Member : 2016-05-31–2016-11-14
Saulius
JAKIMAVIČIUS
Member : 2016-09-20–2016-09-20
Vanda
KRAVČIONOK
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Juzef
KVETKOVSKIJ
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Michal
MACKEVIČ
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Vytautas Antanas
MATULEVIČIUS
Member : 2014-06-20–2016-11-14
Andrius
MAZURONIS
Member : 2015-03-10–2015-04-06
Audrius
NAKAS
Member : 2015-04-14–2016-11-14
Jaroslav
NARKEVIČ
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Algirdas Vaclovas
PATACKAS
Member : 2014-06-20–2015-04-03
Naglis
PUTEIKIS
Member : 2014-03-10–2016-11-14
Valerijus
SIMULIK
Member : 2014-09-11–2016-11-14
Aurelija
STANCIKIENĖ
Member : 2014-06-20–2014-09-17
Deputy Chair: 2014-09-18–2016-11-14
Leonard
TALMONT
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Rita
TAMAŠUNIENĖ
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-21
Povilas
URBŠYS
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Jonas
VARKALA
Member : 2014-06-20–2016-11-14
Valdas
VASILIAUSKAS
Member : 2014-06-20–2014-06-25
Member : 2016-05-31–2016-11-14
© Office of the Seimas
HOME