Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Labour Party Political Group
"The Way of Courage" Political Group (till 06/19/2014)
Order and Justice Political Group
Liberals Movement Political Group
Lithuanian Poles' Electoral Action Political Group
Lithuanian Social Democratic Party Political Group
Non-attached Members
Homeland Union - Lithuanian Christian Democrat Political Group
Parliamentary groups
Order and Justice Political Group
LT
Name
Position
Remigijus
AČAS
Member : 2012-11-16–2013-03-11
Member : 2015-12-22–2016-11-14
Kęstutis
BARTKEVIČIUS
Deputy Chair: 2012-11-16–2016-06-01
Chair: 2016-06-02–2016-11-14
Stasys
BRUNDZA
Member : 2014-07-08–2016-04-20
Algimantas
DUMBRAVA
Member : 2013-03-26–2016-11-14
Povilas
GYLYS
Member : 2015-12-23–2016-05-30
Petras
GRAŽULIS
Chair: 2012-11-16–2016-06-01
Member : 2016-06-02–2016-11-14
Vytautas
KAMBLEVIČIUS
Deputy Chair: 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Kęstas
KOMSKIS
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Valentinas
MAZURONIS
Member : 2012-11-16–2014-06-25
Andrius
MAZURONIS
Member : 2012-11-16–2015-03-09
Rimas Antanas
RUČYS
Member : 2014-06-26–2016-06-13
First Deputy Chair: 2016-06-14–2016-11-14
Jolita
VAICKIENĖ
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-03-23
Ona
VALIUKEVIČIŪTĖ
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
Valdas
VASILIAUSKAS
Member : 2014-06-26–2016-05-30
Julius
VESELKA
Member : 2012-11-16–2012-11-26
Remigijus
ŽEMAITAITIS
Member : 2012-11-16–2016-11-14
© Office of the Seimas
HOME