Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Anticorruption Commission
Energy Commission
Commission for Ethics and Procedures
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs
Commission for Maritime and Fishery Affairs
Constitutional Commission
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Criminal Intelligence
Commission of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Lithuanian World Community
Migration Commission
Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction
Commission for the Rights and Affairs of Participants of Resistance to Occupation Regimes and Victims of Occupation
Petitions Commission
Political groups in the Seimas
Parliamentary groups
Commission for Prevention of Drug and Alcohol Addiction
LT
Name
Position
Rima
BAŠKIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Larisa
DMITRIJEVA
Member : 2012-12-04–2012-12-12
Chair: 2012-12-13–2016-11-14
Vilija
FILIPOVIČIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Vitalijus
GAILIUS
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Vincė Vaidevutė
MARGEVIČIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2012-12-12
Deputy Chair: 2012-12-13–2016-11-14
Antanas
MATULAS
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Marija Aušrinė
PAVILIONIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Giedrė
PURVANECKIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Algirdas
SYSAS
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Rita
TAMAŠUNIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Jolita
VAICKIENĖ
Member : 2012-12-04–2016-11-14
Jonas
VARKALA
Member : 2012-12-04–2015-04-27
Rokas
ŽILINSKAS
Member : 2015-04-28–2016-11-14
© Office of the Seimas
HOME