Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Parliamentary groups
Parliamentary Group for Communities and Civil Society
Parliamentary Group for Supporting Democracy
Parliamentary Group for Friendship with Nagorno-Karabakh
Parliamentary Group of Dzūkija Friends
Parliamentary Group for Innovation and Technological Development
Parliamentary Group for Resorts and Resort Areas
Provisional Group for the Aarhus Convention
Parliamentary Group for Supporting the Lithuanian Armed and Volunteer Forces
Parliamentary Group for Assisting Rural Communities and Farmers in Addressing Matters of Their Concern
Women’s Parliamentary Group
Parliamentary Prayer Group
Parliamentary Group of Friends of Neringa Town
Parliamentary Group “Aukštaitija”
Parliamentary Group “For Democratic Belarus”
Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Cuba
Parliamentary Group for the Territorial Integrity of the GUAM (Georgia, Ukraine, Azerbaijan, Moldova) Countries
Parliamentary Group "Parliamentarians Against Trafficking in Human Beings"
Parliamentary Group “For Historical Memory and Justice”
Parliamentary Group "For Animal Welfare and Protection"
Parliamentary Group “For Adherence to the Oath"
Parliamentary Group “For Corruption-Free Lithuania”
Parliamentary Group “For the Future of Lithuanian Football”
Parliamentary Group “For the Family”
Parliamentary Group “For Human Dignity”
Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Zambia
Parliamentary Group for Monitoring the Coordination of Regional Development
Parliamentary Group of Friends of Šiauliai Region
Parliamentary Group of Vilnius Friends
Parliamentary Group for Development Cooperation and Reproductive Health and Rights
Parliamentary Group for Welfare of the Child
Provisional Group "For the Family"
LT
Name
Title
Mantas
ADOMĖNAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Vilija
ALEKNAITĖ ABRAMIKIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Linas
BALSYS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Rima
BAŠKIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Agnė
BILOTAITĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Bronius
BRADAUSKAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Rimantas Jonas
DAGYS
Head: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Irena
DEGUTIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Algimantas
DUMBRAVA
Member: 2013-04-09–2016-11-14
Vitalijus
GAILIUS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Povilas
GYLYS
Member: 2015-05-14–2016-11-14
Donatas
JANKAUSKAS
Member: 2015-09-17–2016-11-14
Zbignev
JEDINSKIJ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Sergejus
JOVAIŠA
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Liutauras
KAZLAVICKAS
Member: 2013-03-22–2016-11-14
Vanda
KRAVČIONOK
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Dainius
KREIVYS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Andrius
KUBILIUS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Rytas
KUPČINSKAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Kazimieras
KUZMINSKAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Juzef
KVETKOVSKIJ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Michal
MACKEVIČ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Vincė Vaidevutė
MARGEVIČIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Gintautas
MIKOLAITIS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Dangutė
MIKUTIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Jaroslav
NARKEVIČ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Algirdas Vaclovas
PATACKAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2015-04-03
Bronius
PAUŽA
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Naglis
PUTEIKIS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Jurgis
RAZMA
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Irina
ROZOVA
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Paulius
SAUDARGAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Valerijus
SIMULIK
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Artūras
SKARDŽIUS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Aurelija
STANCIKIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Kazys
STARKEVIČIUS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Algis
STRELČIŪNAS
Member: 2015-09-17–2016-11-14
Valentinas
STUNDYS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Leonard
TALMONT
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Rita
TAMAŠUNIENĖ
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Povilas
URBŠYS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Egidijus
VAREIKIS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
Mečislovas
ZASČIURINSKAS
Member: 2012-12-20–2016-11-14
© Office of the Seimas
HOME