Seimas (2012-2016)
Speaker of the Seimas
Board of the Seimas
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Political groups in the Seimas
Parliamentary groups
Parliamentary Group for Communities and Civil Society
Parliamentary Group for Supporting Democracy
Parliamentary Group for Friendship with Nagorno-Karabakh
Parliamentary Group of Dzūkija Friends
Parliamentary Group for Innovation and Technological Development
Parliamentary Group for Resorts and Resort Areas
Provisional Group for the Aarhus Convention
Parliamentary Group for Supporting the Lithuanian Armed and Volunteer Forces
Parliamentary Group for Assisting Rural Communities and Farmers in Addressing Matters of Their Concern
Women’s Parliamentary Group
Parliamentary Prayer Group
Parliamentary Group of Friends of Neringa Town
Parliamentary Group “Aukštaitija”
Parliamentary Group “For Democratic Belarus”
Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Cuba
Parliamentary Group for the Territorial Integrity of the GUAM (Georgia, Ukraine, Azerbaijan, Moldova) Countries
Parliamentary Group "Parliamentarians Against Trafficking in Human Beings"
Parliamentary Group “For Historical Memory and Justice”
Parliamentary Group "For Animal Welfare and Protection"
Parliamentary Group “For Adherence to the Oath"
Parliamentary Group “For Corruption-Free Lithuania”
Parliamentary Group “For the Future of Lithuanian Football”
Parliamentary Group “For the Family”
Parliamentary Group “For Human Dignity”
Parliamentary Group for Relations with the Republic of Zambia
Parliamentary Group for Monitoring the Coordination of Regional Development
Parliamentary Group of Friends of Šiauliai Region
Parliamentary Group of Vilnius Friends
Parliamentary Group for Development Cooperation and Reproductive Health and Rights
Parliamentary Group for Welfare of the Child
Parliamentary Group for Supporting the Lithuanian Armed and Volunteer Forces
LT
Name
Title
Arvydas
ANUŠAUSKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Petras
AUŠTREVIČIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2014-06-27
Audronius
AŽUBALIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Kęstutis
BARTKEVIČIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Agnė
BILOTAITĖ
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Stasys
BRUNDZA
Member: 2014-07-17–2016-11-14
Kęstutis
DAUKŠYS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Arimantas
DUMČIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Vitalijus
GAILIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Vydas
GEDVILAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Eugenijus
GENTVILAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Kęstutis
GLAVECKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Donatas
JANKAUSKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Sergejus
JOVAIŠA
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Rasa
JUKNEVIČIENĖ
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Gediminas
KIRKILAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Andrius
KUBILIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Kazimieras
KUZMINSKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Eligijus
MASIULIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-05-19
Kęstutis
MASIULIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Andrius
MAZURONIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Alma
MONKAUSKAITĖ
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Juozas
OLEKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Algirdas Vaclovas
PATACKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2015-04-03
Domas
PETRULIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Paulius
SAUDARGAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Gintaras
STEPONAVIČIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Algis
STRELČIŪNAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Eduardas
ŠABLINSKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Stasys
ŠEDBARAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Remigijus
ŠIMAŠIUS
Member: 2014-03-13–2015-04-20
Dalia
TEIŠERSKYTĖ
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Povilas
URBŠYS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Arvydas
VIDŽIŪNAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Mečislovas
ZASČIURINSKAS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Emanuelis
ZINGERIS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
Pranas
ŽEIMYS
Member: 2014-03-13–2016-11-14
© Office of the Seimas
HOME