SEIMAS 2004 2008
Speaker of the Seimas
Deputy Speakers
Board of the Seimas
Assembly of Elders
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Committee on Environment Protection
Committee on Audit
Committee on Budget and Finance
Committee on Economics
Committee on European Affairs
Committee of the Development of Information Society
Committee on Rural Affairs
Committee on National Security and Defence
Committee on Social Affairs and Labour
Committee on Health Affairs
Committee on Education, Science and Culture
Committee on Legal Affairs
Committee on Foreign Affairs
Committee on Human Rights
Committee on State Administration and Local Authorities
Commissions
Political Groups in the Seimas
Committee on National Security and Defence
LT
FR
Committee on National Security and Defence (15/11/2004–16/11/2008)
Name
Position
Andrius
BARANAUSKAS
Member: 18/11/2004–23/10/2006
Rimantas
BAŠYS
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
Vytautas
BOGUŠIS
Member: 06/04/2006–17/11/2008
Vytautas
ČEPAS
Member: 18/11/2004–05/04/2006
Member: 08/11/2007–17/11/2008
Algirdas
IVANAUSKAS
Member: 29/04/2008–17/11/2008
Rasa
JUKNEVIČIENĖ
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
Algis
KAŠĖTA
Member: 18/11/2004–28/11/2004
Deputy Chairman : 29/11/2004–17/11/2008
Gediminas
KIRKILAS
Member: 18/11/2004–18/07/2006
Romualda
KŠANIENĖ
Member: 24/10/2006–17/11/2008
Algimantas
MATULEVIČIUS
Member: 18/11/2004–18/10/2006
Chairman: 19/10/2006–19/06/2008
Member: 20/06/2008–17/11/2008
Juozas
OLEKAS
Member: 24/10/2006–07/11/2007
Skirmantas
PABEDINSKAS
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
Saulius
PEČELIŪNAS
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
Milda
PETRAUSKIENĖ
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
Alvydas
SADECKAS
Member: 18/11/2004–22/11/2004
Chairman: 23/11/2004–18/10/2006
Member: 19/10/2006–19/06/2008
Chairman: 20/06/2008–17/11/2008
Rimantas
SMETONA
Member: 18/11/2004–17/11/2008
© Office of the Seimas, 2008
HOME