SEIMAS 2004 2008
Speaker of the Seimas
Deputy Speakers
Board of the Seimas
Assembly of Elders
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Anticorruption Commission
Commission for Ethics and Procedures
Commission on the Problems of Ignalina Nuclear Power Plant
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs
Commission for Maritime and Fishery Affairs
Constitutional Commission
Commission for Prevention of Drug Addiction
Commission for NATO Affairs
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Intelligence Operations
Commission for the Rights and Affairs of Participants of Resistance to Occupation Regimes and Victims of Occupation
Petitions Commission
Commission for Regional Development
Commission for Family and Child Affairs
Commission for Business and Employment
Commission of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Lithuanian World Community (LWC)
Political Groups in the Seimas
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs
LT
FR
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs (15/11/2004–16/11/2008)
Name
Position
Vytautas
GALVONAS
Member : 13/03/2008–17/11/2008
Vydas
GEDVILAS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Saulius
GIRDAUSKAS
Member : 16/12/2004–19/01/2005
Deputy Chairman of Commission: 20/01/2005–17/11/2008
Gediminas
JAKAVONIS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Rytas
KUPČINSKAS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Eligijus
MASIULIS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Vytas
NAVICKAS
Member : 16/12/2004–04/12/2006
Algirdas
PALECKIS
Member : 28/03/2006–14/04/2007
Marija Aušrinė
PAVILIONIENĖ
Member : 16/12/2004–12/03/2008
Edmundas
PUPINIS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Algimantas
SALAMAKINAS
Member : 16/12/2004–21/12/2004
Chairman of Commission: 22/12/2004–17/11/2008
Algirdas
SYSAS
Member : 16/12/2004–27/03/2006
Member : 17/04/2007–17/11/2008
Artūras
SKARDŽIUS
Member : 05/12/2006–17/11/2008
Gintaras
ŠILEIKIS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
© Office of the Seimas, 2008
HOME