SEIMAS 2004 2008
Speaker of the Seimas
Deputy Speakers
Board of the Seimas
Assembly of Elders
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Anticorruption Commission
Commission for Ethics and Procedures
Commission on the Problems of Ignalina Nuclear Power Plant
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs
Commission for Maritime and Fishery Affairs
Constitutional Commission
Commission for Prevention of Drug Addiction
Commission for NATO Affairs
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Intelligence Operations
Commission for the Rights and Affairs of Participants of Resistance to Occupation Regimes and Victims of Occupation
Petitions Commission
Commission for Regional Development
Commission for Family and Child Affairs
Commission for Business and Employment
Commission of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Lithuanian World Community (LWC)
Political Groups in the Seimas
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Intelligence Operations
LT
FR
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Intelligence Operations (15/11/2004–16/11/2008)
Name
Position
Vytautas
ČEPAS
Member : 20/03/2005–30/03/2005
Deputy Chairman of Commission: 31/03/2005–17/11/2008
Kęstutis
DAUKŠYS
Member : 20/03/2005–30/03/2005
Chairman of Commission: 31/03/2005–04/07/2005
Member : 05/07/2005–10/10/2005
Loreta
GRAUŽINIENĖ
Member : 20/11/2007–17/11/2008
Algirdas
IVANAUSKAS
Member : 11/10/2005–12/10/2005
Chairman of Commission: 13/10/2005–17/11/2008
Gediminas
JAKAVONIS
Member : 20/03/2005–13/11/2006
Juozas
PALIONIS
Member : 20/03/2005–17/11/2008
Saulius
PEČELIŪNAS
Member : 14/11/2006–17/11/2008
Viktoras
RINKEVIČIUS
Member : 20/03/2005–17/11/2008
Alvydas
SADECKAS
Member : 14/11/2006–17/11/2008
Vidmantas
ŽIEMELIS
Member : 20/03/2005–13/11/2006
Zita
ŽVIKIENĖ
Member : 20/03/2005–19/11/2007
© Office of the Seimas, 2008
HOME