SEIMAS 2004 2008
Speaker of the Seimas
Deputy Speakers
Board of the Seimas
Assembly of Elders
Members of the Seimas
Committees
Commissions
Anticorruption Commission
Commission for Ethics and Procedures
Commission on the Problems of Ignalina Nuclear Power Plant
Commission for Youth and Sport Affairs
Commission for Maritime and Fishery Affairs
Constitutional Commission
Commission for Prevention of Drug Addiction
Commission for NATO Affairs
Commission for Parliamentary Scrutiny of Intelligence Operations
Commission for the Rights and Affairs of Participants of Resistance to Occupation Regimes and Victims of Occupation
Petitions Commission
Commission for Regional Development
Commission for Family and Child Affairs
Commission for Business and Employment
Commission of the Seimas of the Republic of Lithuania and the Lithuanian World Community (LWC)
Political Groups in the Seimas
Commission for NATO Affairs
LT
FR
Commission for NATO Affairs (15/11/2004–16/11/2008)
Name
Position
Petras
AUŠTREVIČIUS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Audronius
AŽUBALIS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Kazys
BOBELIS
Member : 16/12/2004–31/05/2006
Jonas
ČEKUOLIS
Member : 09/11/2006–15/11/2006
Chairman of Commission: 16/11/2006–17/11/2008
Rasa
JUKNEVIČIENĖ
Member : 16/12/2004–14/02/2005
Deputy Chairman of Commission: 15/02/2005–17/11/2008
Vytautas
KAMBLEVIČIUS
Member : 09/11/2006–17/11/2008
Egidijus
KLUMBYS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Algirdas
PALECKIS
Member : 09/11/2006–14/04/2007
Alfredas
PEKELIŪNAS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Vaclav
STANKEVIČ
Member : 16/12/2004–21/12/2004
Chairman of Commission: 22/12/2004–29/05/2006
Member : 30/05/2006–04/12/2006
Mindaugas
SUBAČIUS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Romas
VENCLOVAS
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Vilija
VERTELIENĖ
Member : 16/12/2004–17/11/2008
Roma
ŽAKAITIENĖ
Member : 16/12/2004–08/11/2006
© Office of the Seimas, 2008
HOME