| | Juozas OLEKAS
| |
Member of the Seimas from 15/11/2004 till 17/11/2008.
|
|
|
Position
Committees of the SeimasPolitical Groups of the SeimasParliamentary Groups- Assembly of Elders, Member ( 15/11/2004–11/09/2006 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with Japan, Member ( 02/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the Russian Federation, Member ( 02/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with Ireland, Member ( 09/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the USA, Member ( 09/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the Chechen Republic of Itchkeria, Member ( 09/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the Commonwealth of Australia and New Zealand, Member ( 22/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with Taiwan, Member ( 22/12/2004–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with India Republic, Member ( 01/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with North European countries (Denmark, Norway, Finland, Sweden, Iceland), Member ( 01/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with South African Republic, Member ( 01/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with Moldova, Member ( 01/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the Republic of Austria, Member ( 18/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, Member ( 20/01/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group for Interparliamentary Relations with the Association of European Parliamentarians with Africa, Member ( 08/02/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Group of Lisbon, Member ( 01/03/2005–17/11/2008 )
- Seimas Delegation to the NATO Parliamentary Assembly, Member ( 18/07/2006–17/11/2008 )
History
Was elected to the Seimas 1996 – 2000.
Was elected to the Seimas 2000 – 2004.